TN HB0267 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that governor is authorized, but not required, to make appointments to the board of optometry from lists of nominees provided by the Tennessee Optometric Association. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Section 63-8-105.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that governor is authorized, but not required, to make appointments to the board of optometry from lists of nominees provided by the Tennessee Optometric Association. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Section 63-8-105.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-03 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0152 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-04 - Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0267&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0267.pdf |