TN HB0255 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the Tennessee auctioneer commission, June 30, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 62, Chapter 19, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the Tennessee auctioneer commission, June 30, 2013. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 62, Chapter 19, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 5 | |
2011-04-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-03-02 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-03-01 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-03-01 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-02-28 | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2011-02-28 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-02-28 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-02-28 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-02-28 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2011-02-24 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar 1 for 2/28/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules for 2/24/11 | |
2011-02-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/15/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-03 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0159 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5