TN HB0243 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires all campuses of public higher education institutions operated by the board of regents or University of Tennessee board of trustees to hold observances for Veterans Day on or near the day recognized as the national day of observance. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, requires all campuses of public higher education institutions operated by the board of regents or University of Tennessee board of trustees to hold observances for Veterans Day on or near the day recognized as the national day of observance. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] |
Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. Bill Sanderson [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Rick Womick [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. David Shepard [D] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 482 | |
2015-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Failed for lack of motion in: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1345 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 482