TN HB0241 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes, for a period of two years, certain establishments authorized to sell alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption to also offer drive-through, pickup, and carryout orders; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to off-premises consumption of alcoholic beverages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE REREFER TO COMMITTEE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY HULSEY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY CARR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY CARR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY COCHRAN PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY ZACHARY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 57 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19 Pub. Ch. 451
2021-05-19 Effective date(s) 05/14/2021
2021-05-14 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-04HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-28HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-28SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 4, PNV 2
2021-04-28SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0404)
2021-04-28SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0217)
2021-04-28SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-22SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-21HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-21HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 21, PNV 4
2021-04-21HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0353)
2021-04-21HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0161)
2021-04-21HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 7 - HA0364)
2021-04-21HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 6 - HA0363)
2021-04-21HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA0362)
2021-04-21HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA0365)
2021-04-21HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA0359)
2021-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021
2021-04-13HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/13/2021
2021-04-07HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-30HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-03-09HouseAction Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/23/2021
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0681 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0241&ga=112
Texthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/HB0241.pdf
Texthttps://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/112/pub/pc0451.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0161.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0353.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0359.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0365.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0362.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0363.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0364.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/HB0241.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0572.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM1205.pdf
Roll Callhttps://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0241&ga=112

Bill Comments 750

feedback