TN SB0681 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes, for a period of two years, certain establishments authorized to sell alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption to also offer drive-through, pickup, and carryout orders; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to off-premises consumption of alcoholic beverages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451
2021-04-28SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 2
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-06SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
2021-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0241 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 451

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback