TN HB0236 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a medical facility from holding the victim of domestic abuse responsible for the payment of a forensic medical examination and provides for compensation of such exam by the criminal injuries compensation fund. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 13
Title
As introduced, prohibits a medical facility from holding the victim of domestic abuse responsible for the payment of a forensic medical examination and provides for compensation of such exam by the criminal injuries compensation fund. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 13
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0016 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0236&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0236.pdf |