TN SB0016 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a medical facility from holding the victim of domestic abuse responsible for the payment of a forensic medical examination and provides for compensation of such exam by the criminal injuries compensation fund. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 13

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits a medical facility from holding the victim of domestic abuse responsible for the payment of a forensic medical examination and provides for compensation of such exam by the criminal injuries compensation fund. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 13

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-09 P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm.
2009-02-09 Ref. to S. Jud. Comm.
2009-01-15 Intro., P1C.
2009-01-14 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0236 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback