TN HB0217 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, broadens law enforcement training on interacting with mentally ill persons to also include training on interacting with persons having autism, mental retardation, or developmental disabilities. - Amends TCA Section 4-7-107; Section 38-8-112 and Section 38-8-119.
Title
As introduced, broadens law enforcement training on interacting with mentally ill persons to also include training on interacting with persons having autism, mental retardation, or developmental disabilities. - Amends TCA Section 4-7-107; Section 38-8-112 and Section 38-8-119.
Sponsors
Rep. John Forgety [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0541 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-12 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0217&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0217.pdf |