TN SB0541 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, broadens law enforcement training on interacting with mentally ill persons to also include training on interacting with persons having autism, mental retardation, or developmental disabilities. - Amends TCA Section 4-7-107; Section 38-8-112 and Section 38-8-119.
Title
As introduced, broadens law enforcement training on interacting with mentally ill persons to also include training on interacting with persons having autism, mental retardation, or developmental disabilities. - Amends TCA Section 4-7-107; Section 38-8-112 and Section 38-8-119.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. John Forgety [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0217 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0541&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0541.pdf |