TN HB0217 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA to provide transitional kindergarten program for children admitted to kindergarten who are developmentally delayed, as determined by the LEA, as prerequisite to attending kindergarten. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires each LEA to provide transitional kindergarten program for children admitted to kindergarten who are developmentally delayed, as determined by the LEA, as prerequisite to attending kindergarten. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Education--Government Operations for review | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0203 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0217&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0217.pdf |