TN HB0214 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an advisory task force of farmers and foresters to lead a strategic planning process and resulting implementation plan to position this state as a leading hub for agtech and value-added agriculture; requires a report to the general assembly no later than August 31, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11, Chapter 4; Title 43; Title 44; Title 49 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 11, Chapter 4; Title 43; Title 44; Title 49 and Title 67, relative to agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action def. in Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0875 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee