TN SB0875 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an advisory task force of farmers and foresters to lead a strategic planning process and resulting implementation plan to position this state as a leading hub for agtech and value-added agriculture; requires a report to the general assembly no later than August 31, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11, Chapter 4; Title 43; Title 44; Title 49 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 11, Chapter 4; Title 43; Title 44; Title 49 and Title 67, relative to agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0214 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee