TN HB0212 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires K-12 education funding to be passed by the house of representatives and the senate prior to consideration of general appropriations bill for funding the remainder of state government. - Amends TCA Title 9.
Title
As introduced, requires K-12 education funding to be passed by the house of representatives and the senate prior to consideration of general appropriations bill for funding the remainder of state government. - Amends TCA Title 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Finance | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0237 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0212&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0212.pdf |