TN HB0190 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires volunteer fire departments receiving public funds to file an annual financial report with the state comptroller and the local governments from which they receive funding. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 102, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, requires volunteer fire departments receiving public funds to file an annual financial report with the state comptroller and the local governments from which they receive funding. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 102, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 210 | |
2015-04-06 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-02 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to State Government Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee--State Government |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0415 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 210