TN HB0169 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires county election commissions to designate public institutions of higher education with 20,000 or more enrolled students as polling places during early voting in federal and state general elections and presidential primaries for a period of at least five days; authorizes the institution to select the days for early voting. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 1 and Title 2, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 1 and Title 2, Chapter 6, Part 1, relative to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Withdrawn. |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2021-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0346 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee