TN HB0168 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the disposal of delinquent and unruly juvenile court records and documents after a period of 10 years following the juvenile reaching 18 years of age; requires notice of proposed order to district attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 18, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the disposal of delinquent and unruly juvenile court records and documents after a period of 10 years following the juvenile reaching 18 years of age; requires notice of proposed order to district attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 18, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 242 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 05/02/2019 | |
2019-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-17 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 96, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0168 |
2019-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/17/19 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0212) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0214 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 242