TN SB0214 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the disposal of delinquent and unruly juvenile court records and documents after a period of 10 years following the juvenile reaching 18 years of age; requires notice of proposed order to district attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 18, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the disposal of delinquent and unruly juvenile court records and documents after a period of 10 years following the juvenile reaching 18 years of age; requires notice of proposed order to district attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 18, Chapter 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 242
2019-04-11SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0168 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 242

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback