TN HB0118 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, codifies the Acts of the 2020 regular and extraordinary sessions.
Title
AN ACT to revise and codify the general and public statutes of the State of Tennessee, to the extent incorporated herein, as a part of Tennessee Code Annotated; to provide in case of any conflict between Acts of the regular or any extraordinary 2021 Session of the General Assembly and this Act, the former shall be controlling, regardless of the respective dates of passage or approval; and to repeal all acts or parts of acts codified in this Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 33 | |
2021-03-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0108 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-29 - Effective date(s) 03/23/2021