TN HB0116 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, disqualifies for life persons convicted of trafficking for a commercial sex act from obtaining a commercial driver license; requires lifetime suspension of commercial driver license for persons convicted of trafficking for a commercial sex act. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3 and Title 55, Chapter 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3 and Title 55, Chapter 50, relative to lifetime disqualification from driving commercial motor vehicles after conviction for trafficking offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-03-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
2021-03-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/10/2021
2021-03-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Transportation Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0115 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback