TN SB0115 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, disqualifies for life persons convicted of trafficking for a commercial sex act from obtaining a commercial driver license; requires lifetime suspension of commercial driver license for persons convicted of trafficking for a commercial sex act. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3 and Title 55, Chapter 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 3 and Title 55, Chapter 50, relative to lifetime disqualification from driving commercial motor vehicles after conviction for trafficking offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0116 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-02 - Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback