TN HB0106 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the retail sale of Class C common fireworks in Millington. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 104.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the retail sale of Class C common fireworks in Millington. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 104.
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] |
Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 66 | |
2019-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0458 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 66