TN HB0105 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-28 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 15 to 17 the maximum number of members on a solid waste authority board of directors that is chosen separately from the board for a municipal solid waste region. - Amends TCA Title 55; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, increases from 15 to 17 the maximum number of members on a solid waste authority board of directors that is chosen separately from the board for a municipal solid waste region. - Amends TCA Title 55; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0924 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee