TN SB0924 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 15 to 17 the maximum number of members on a solid waste authority board of directors that is chosen separately from the board for a municipal solid waste region. - Amends TCA Title 55; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, increases from 15 to 17 the maximum number of members on a solid waste authority board of directors that is chosen separately from the board for a municipal solid waste region. - Amends TCA Title 55; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0105 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-28 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.