TN HB0070 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the date of the repeal of the Virtual Public Schools Act from June 30, 2019, to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 16.
Title
As enacted, extends the date of the repeal of the Virtual Public Schools Act from June 30, 2019, to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 16.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 283 | |
2019-04-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/19 |
2019-04-22 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration Subcommittee to 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 2/12/2019 |
2019-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c House Education Administration Subcommittee |
2019-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0020 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 283