TN SB0020 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the date of the repeal of the Virtual Public Schools Act from June 30, 2019, to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 16.
Title
As enacted, extends the date of the repeal of the Virtual Public Schools Act from June 30, 2019, to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Pub. Ch. 283 | |
2019-05-13 | Effective date(s) 05/08/2019 | |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 20, PNV 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 1 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/11/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/6/2019 |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0070 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 283