TN HB0067 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows court to award attorney fees and expenses if motion to quash subpoena is granted when deponent is exempt from subpoena. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-101.
Title
As enacted, allows court to award attorney fees and expenses if motion to quash subpoena is granted when deponent is exempt from subpoena. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-101.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Pub. Ch. 55 | |
2009-04-22 | Effective date(s) 04/14/09 | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-04-02 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-02 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-04-02 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 1 | |
2009-04-02 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-03-16 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-03-12 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-10 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 02/24/2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-09 | Ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-01-14 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0475 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 55