TN HB0025 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of transportation to report on or before February 1, 2024, to the transportation committee of the house of representatives and the transportation and safety committee of the senate on any recommendations for changes that would improve transportation services for passengers with disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 10, relative to transportation services.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | House | Caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2023-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0232 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee