TN HB0015 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the terminating events for receipt of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship beginning with the 2012-2013 academic year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, changes the terminating events for receipt of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship beginning with the 2012-2013 academic year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/7/2012 | |
2011-04-13 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Assigned to General Sub of Education | |
2011-01-13 | Ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-01-13 | P2C held on desk pending the appointment of standing committees. | |
2011-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1401 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0015&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0015.pdf |