TN HB0012 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts "April's Law" to clarify that a person who engages in sexual contact with a corpse commits the offense of abuse of a corpse, a Class E felony; requires law enforcement officers to ask victims of stalking, domestic abuse, or sexual assault whether the victim requests the defendant be required to wear GPS-tracker if released on bond. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3; Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3; Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2, relative to criminal offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-02-25HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-25HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-11-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0951 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback