TN SB0951 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "April's Law" to clarify that a person who engages in sexual contact with a corpse commits the offense of abuse of a corpse, a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3; Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3; Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2, relative to criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 402 | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0012 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021