TN HB0008 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds public employees to the list of those ineligible for suspended prosecution and pretrial diversion for a misdemeanor offense committed in the course of the person's employment, under the same provisions currently applicable to elected and appointed state and local officials so charged. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 15.
Title
As enacted, adds public employees to the list of those ineligible for suspended prosecution and pretrial diversion for a misdemeanor offense committed in the course of the person's employment, under the same provisions currently applicable to elected and appointed state and local officials so charged. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 15.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 93 | |
2017-03-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-01-12 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2017-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0690 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 93