TN SB0690 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds public employees to the list of those ineligible for suspended prosecution and pretrial diversion for a misdemeanor offense committed in the course of the person's employment, under the same provisions currently applicable to elected and appointed state and local officials so charged. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 15.
Title
As enacted, adds public employees to the list of those ineligible for suspended prosecution and pretrial diversion for a misdemeanor offense committed in the course of the person's employment, under the same provisions currently applicable to elected and appointed state and local officials so charged. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 15.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 93 | |
2017-04-11 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 6, PNV 2 |
2017-03-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 3 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/9/2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0008 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 93