TN HB0007 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the use of campaign funds for the child care expenditures of a candidate that are incurred by the candidate as a direct result of the candidate's participation in campaign-related events and activities. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10 and Title 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the use of campaign funds for the child care expenditures of a candidate that are incurred by the candidate as a direct result of the candidate's participation in campaign-related events and activities. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10 and Title 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseFailed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/13/2019
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2019-01-10HouseRef. to Local Committee
2019-01-09HouseP2C held on desk.
2019-01-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-12-12HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0086 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback