TN HB0006 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 449
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 449
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allocates state sales tax revenue derived from sales of admissions to events of a major league soccer franchise to the municipality in which a sports authority is organized and has secured the franchise. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, allocates state sales tax revenue derived from sales of admissions to events of a major league soccer franchise to the municipality in which a sports authority is organized and has secured the franchise. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 449 | |
2017-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 2, PNV 2 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2017-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-01-12 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2017-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0003 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 449