TN HB0002 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - Failed In s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - Failed In s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Equal and Fair Parenting Act" to create a rebuttable presumption that equally shared parenting is the custody arrangement in the best interest of a child. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Equal and Fair Parenting Act" to create a rebuttable presumption that equally shared parenting is the custody arrangement in the best interest of a child. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-15 - House - DOMESTIC RELATIONS OF C&FA: Recommended for passage - refer to: Children and Family Affairs Committee (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Failed In s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 02/18/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | Assigned to s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA | |
2009-02-09 | Ref. to Children & Family Affairs | |
2009-01-14 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2008-12-01 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0181 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm.