TN SB0181 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Equal and Fair Parenting Act" to create a rebuttable presumption that equally shared parenting is the custody arrangement in the best interest of a child. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Equal and Fair Parenting Act" to create a rebuttable presumption that equally shared parenting is the custody arrangement in the best interest of a child. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm. | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0002 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-15 - Failed In s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0181&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0181.pdf |