SD SJR3 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To apply for a convention of states under Article V of the Constitution of the United States to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government.
Title
To apply for a convention of states under Article V of the Constitution of the United States to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 472 |
2018-02-13 | House | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 446 |
2018-02-12 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 428 |
2018-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-22 | House | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 177 |