SD SCR11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 589
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 589
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting that the President of the United States designate a single state funeral be held upon the death of the last living identifiable veteran from World War II.
Title
Requesting that the President of the United States designate a single state funeral be held upon the death of the last living identifiable veteran from World War II.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Sen. Lynn Disanto [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] |
Rep. Manny Steele [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs Concurred in Resolution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs Concurred in Resolution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 589 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Military and Veterans Affairs Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 567 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 551 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 499 Amendment c11ya |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 499 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Military and Veterans Affairs Title amended, Passed S.J. 452 Amendment c11wta |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Military and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment c11wa |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 428 |