SD SB66 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require each school board to provide certain information regarding school elections in the school board minutes.
Title
Require each school board to provide certain information regarding school elections in the school board minutes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] |
Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428 |
2018-02-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 06, 2018 S.J. 383 |
2018-02-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 347 |
2018-02-02 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 358 |
2018-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 9. H.J. 297 |
2018-01-31 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 2. H.J. 241 |
2018-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2018-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 115 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 138 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Education Title amended, Passed S.J. 89 Amendment 66cta |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 66ja |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 66ca |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 47 |