SD SB53 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2021 S.J. 336
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certification and renewal fees for water supply and treatment system operators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certification and renewal fees for water supply and treatment system operators.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Immediate Reconsideration (Rule 5-13.1) (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateSigned by the Governor on February 24, 2021 S.J. 336
2021-02-18SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 18, 2021 S.J. 293
2021-02-17HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 307
2021-02-16SenateSigned by the President S.J. 271
2021-02-11SenateSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 249
2021-02-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 7. H.J. 256
2021-02-09HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 256 Amendment 53A
2021-02-09HouseImmediate Reconsideration (Rule 5-13.1), YEAS 66, NAYS 4. H.J. 254
2021-02-08HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 246
2021-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 33. H.J. 246
2021-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 229
2021-02-04HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
2021-02-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 129
2021-01-25SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 106
2021-01-22SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 97
2021-01-21SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 90
2021-01-19SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-01-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback