SD SB40 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Signed by the Governor on February 01, 2021 S.J. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Signed by the Governor on February 01, 2021 S.J. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain references to the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
Revise certain references to the Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Taxation: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Taxation: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 01, 2021 S.J. 140 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 01, 2021 S.J. 140 |
2021-01-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 159 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 137 |
2021-01-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 141 |
2021-01-26 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 110 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 88 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 18 |