SD SB26 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clarify certain provisions regarding the regulation of limited gaming in Deadwood, South Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarify certain provisions regarding the regulation of limited gaming in Deadwood, South Dakota.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseSigned by the Governor on January 31, 2019 S.J. 260
2019-01-29HouseDelivered to the Governor on January 29, 2019 S.J. 211
2019-01-28HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 226
2019-01-25HouseSigned by the President S.J. 194
2019-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 172
2019-01-23HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-23HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 155
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-16HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 130
2019-01-15SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 98
2019-01-14SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 70
2019-01-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 26

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback