SD SB197 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding the alcohol beverage fund.
Title
Revise provisions regarding the alcohol beverage fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Deibert [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Roger Chase [R] | Rep. Lance Koth [R] |
Rep. John Mills [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-15 | Joint | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 220 |