SD SB18 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2022 S.J. 324
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2022 S.J. 324
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise rulemaking authority related to medical cannabis.
Title
Revise rulemaking authority related to medical cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2022 S.J. 324 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 15, 2022 S.J. 253 |
2022-02-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 288 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 234 |
2022-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 247 |
2022-02-08 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 129 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 16. S.J. 107 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 95 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 12 |