SD SB18 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update certain references to federal laws and regulations regarding pipeline safety inspections and to increase the maximum civil penalty for certain pipeline safety violations.
Title
Update certain references to federal laws and regulations regarding pipeline safety inspections and to increase the maximum civil penalty for certain pipeline safety violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672 |
2019-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 622 |
2019-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 553 |
2019-02-25 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-25 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 515 |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 160 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 119 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 24 |
Subjects
Energy Facilities
Environmental Protection
Public Health and Safety
Public Officers and Employees
Public Utilities and Carriers
Environmental Protection
Public Health and Safety
Public Officers and Employees
Public Utilities and Carriers