SD SB168 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the amount of coverage provided by the South Dakota Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association for long-term care insurance.
Title
Increase the amount of coverage provided by the South Dakota Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association for long-term care insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 603 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 706 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-03-03 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 673 | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-18 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 465 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 352 | |
2010-02-16 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 327 | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 207 |