SD HCR6009 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urging priority to be given to in-state advertising agencies over out-of-state agencies for state issued requests for proposals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging priority to be given to in-state advertising agencies over out-of-state agencies for state issued requests for proposals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3.
2021-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 349
2021-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 381
2021-02-23HouseCommittee assignment waived H.J. 355
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 327

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback