SD HB1311 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 29, NAYS 38. H.J. 375
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 29, NAYS 38. H.J. 375
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the means of voluntarily terminating a relationship between a birth mother and a child.
Title
Clarify the means of voluntarily terminating a relationship between a birth mother and a child.
Sponsors
Rep. Bethany Soye [R] | Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] | Rep. Steven Haugaard [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] |
Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Tony Randolph [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] |
Rep. Marli Wiese [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 29, NAYS 38. H.J. 375 |
2022-02-14 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. |
2022-02-14 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1311A |
2022-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 211 |
2022-02-02 | House | First Reading House H.J. 178 |