SD HB1258 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protect an individual's conscience from entities requiring the COVID-19 vaccine.
Title
Protect an individual's conscience from entities requiring the COVID-19 vaccine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 329 |
2022-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 30. H.J. 410 |
2022-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 409 Amendment 1258B |
2022-02-16 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. |
2022-02-16 | House | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1258A |
2022-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 247 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |