SD HB1235 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the platting of certain land without infrastructure requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the platting of certain land without infrastructure requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House of Representatives: Concurred in amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Taxation: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-03HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 488
2021-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 459
2021-03-01SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 366
2021-02-24SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-24SenateLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2021-02-24SenateLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1235A
2021-02-24SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-11SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 250
2021-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 273
2021-02-09HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 2
2021-02-09HouseTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-04HouseReferred to House Taxation H.J. 212
2021-02-03HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 190

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback